Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 27, 2024
Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024