04/19/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
04/12/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/12/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |