Page 1 June 4, 2024 SB 24-128 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 24-0894 Sen. Hinrichsen; Pelton B. Rep. Bradley; McLachlan Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: June 4, 2024 Signed into Law Colin Gaiser | 303-866-2677 colin.gaiser@coleg.gov Bill Topic: REPEAL CDOT 2011 RECOMMENDATION REQUIREMENT Summary of Fiscal Impact: No fiscal impact. The bill repeals outdated language in the Department of Transportation’s statutes. It is assessed as having no fiscal impact on state and local governments. Appropriation Summary: No appropriation is required. Fiscal Note Status: The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. Summary of Legislation The bill repeals a requirement that the Department of Transportation (CDOT) study actions that could be taken on or before July 1, 2014, regarding mobility improvement possibilities for the Interstate 70 mountain corridor, and make prioritized recommendations to the General Assembly by December 20, 2011. Assessment of No Fiscal Impact The bill updates CDOT statute to eliminate an obsolete provision. This results in no change to state or local government revenue or expenditures. For this reason, the bill is assessed as having no fiscal impact. Effective Date The bill was signed into law by the Governor on April 19, 2024, and takes effect on August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. State and Local Government Contacts Transportation The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.