Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB139 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/30/2024

                    Page 1 
July 30, 2024  SB 24-139 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0947  
Sen. Gonzales 
Rep. deGruy Kennedy; 
Lindstedt  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 30, 2024 
Signed into Law  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CREATION OF 911 SERVICES ENTERPRISE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the 911 Services Enterprise in the Department of Regulatory Affairs. 
The bill increases state expenditures beginning in FY 2024-25 and state revenue 
beginning FY 2025-26. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the enacted bill includes an appropriation of $107,695 to the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-139 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-     at least $696,000     
 	Total Revenue 	- at least $696,000 
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$107,695      	-     
 	Cash Funds 	- at least $677,281  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$14,975  $18,719  
 
Total Expenditures 	$122,670  at least $696,000 
 	Total FTE 	1.0 FTE 1.2 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$16,194 	- 
   Page 2 
July 30, 2024  SB 24-139 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, a 911 surcharge is imposed on 911 service users by the Public Utilities 
Commission (PUC) which is calculated to reasonably meet the needs of local governing bodies 
for operating 911 services. This bill creates the 911 Services Enterprise in the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies (DORA) and permits the enterprise to charge a fee in addition to the 
surcharge. The enterprise is governed by a board of directors appointed by the Governor and 
consisting of representatives of the telecommunications industry and from governing bodies of 
local jurisdictions. 
The enterprise’s primary powers are to impose a 911 enterprise fee on service users to fund 
expenses such as statewide training initiatives and programs for 911 center personnel, public 
education campaigns and materials, and other 911 related training and support. The enterprise 
may establish grant programs for the benefit of local governing bodies or for use as matching 
funds for eligible projects. The fee must also pay the expenses necessary for administration of 
the enterprise. Revenue from the fee are put in the 911 Enterprise Cash Fund and continuously 
appropriated to the enterprise for administration and other programs.    
Beginning June 30, 2026, the enterprise must prepare an annual financial report to Legislative 
Council Staff and the Joint Budget Committee. The financial report must include the enterprise's 
projected revenue and expenditures and proposed budget for the following fiscal year. 
State Revenue 
The bill is expected to increase state cash fund revenue from fees by at least $696,000 per year 
beginning in FY 2025-26. This revenue is deposited to the 911 Enterprise Cash Fund and is 
exempt from the state’s revenue limit under TABOR.   
Fee impact on telephone users. Colorado law requires legislative service agency review of 
measures which create or increase any fee collected by a state agency. The bill requires that a 
new fee must be established by the governing board for the enterprise, which together with the 
existing 911 surcharge, cannot exceed $0.50 per month (currently, the state 911 surcharge 
collected by the PUC is $0.09 per month). Based on prior funding to the 911 Resource Center 
($250,000 per year) the fiscal note assumes that the fee will be set on the low end of the 
potential range, at $0.01 per month. This fee amount is an estimate only; actual fees will be set 
administratively by the enterprise based on cash fund balance, program costs, and the number 
of users subject to the fee. The table below identifies the fee impact of this bill.    Page 3 
July 30, 2024  SB 24-139 
 
 
 
Table 2 
Fee Impact on Telephone Users 
Fiscal Year Type of Fee 
Estimated 
Annual Fee
1
 
Number 
Affected 
Total Fee 
Impact 
FY 2025-26 and 
future years 
911 Enterprise Fee 	$0.12 5,800,000 $696,000 
1
 This fee assumes a surcharge of $0.01 per month. The actual fee may differ based on decisions by the new 
enterprise board. 
State Expenditures 
This bill increases state expenditures by about $123,000 in FY 2024-25 paid from the General 
Fund.  In FY 2025-26, expenditures are estimated to be at least $696,000, depending on the fee 
amount set by the enterprise. Expenditures are shown in Table 3 and described below. 
Table 3 
Expenditures Under SB 24-139 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Regulatory Agencies   
Personal Services 	$61,595  	$76,994  
Operating Expenses 	$1,024  	$1,280  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670  	-  
Legal Services 	$38,406  	$38,406  
911 Enterprise Programs 	- at least $560,601 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$14,975  	$18,719  
FTE – Personal Services 	0.8 FTE 	1.0 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.2 FTE 	0.2 FTE 
Total Cost $122,670  at least $696,000  
Total FTE 	1.0 FTE 	1.2 FTE 
2
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Administration. The DORA will require 1.0 FTE for a program administrator beginning in 
FY 2024-25 to set up the new enterprise and work with the Governor’s office to empanel the 
governing board, establish bylaws for basic administration, and begin the process to determine 
the appropriate 911 enterprise fee. Since the enterprise must organize and begin work without a 
revenue stream, this fiscal note assumes that General Fund is necessary to create the enterprise 
in FY 2024-25, and that cash fund revenue in FY 2025-26 will be used for both administrative 
and program expenses. Costs in FY 2024-25 are prorated for a September 1 start date. DORA 
and the new enterprise will require ongoing legal support from the Department of Law for rule 
making and other tasks.  Page 4 
July 30, 2024  SB 24-139 
 
 
 
911 enterprise programs. Assuming revenue of $696,000 in revenue is collected annually 
beginning in FY 2025-26, the new enterprise is estimated to spend approximately $560,000 per 
year for programs supporting 911 service operators, after accounting for administrative costs. 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve in FY 2024-25 only, 
by the amount shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other 
purposes. 
Local Government 
To the extent that local governments receive grants or monetary support through the new 
enterprise, revenue will increase. Workload and expenditures will correspondingly increase to 
pursue grants, comply with grant requirements, and use available funding on allowable uses. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 31, 2024, and it takes effect August 7, 2024, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the enacted bill includes a General Fund appropriation of $107,695 to the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies, and 0.8 FTE. Of this amount, $38,406 is reappropriated to 
the Department of Law, and 0.2 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law   Regulatory Agencies    Treasury  
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.