Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 2, 2024
Fiscal Note April 12, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill May 5, 2024
Bill May 4, 2024