Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 10, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024