Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 5, 2024
Fiscal Note April 26, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note March 18, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024