Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REENGROSSED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the House of Introduction LLS NO. 24-0990.01 Rebecca Bayetti x4348 SENATE BILL 24-170 Senate Committees House Committees State, Veterans, & Military Affairs A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING THE AMERICA 250 - COLORADO 150 COMMISSION.101 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill adds the following 4 members to the America 250 - Colorado 150 commission (commission), to be appointed by the governor: ! 2 members representing Indigenous communities who are members of a federally recognized tribe with historic ties to Colorado that is not the Ute Mountain Ute Tribe or the Southern Ute Indian Tribe; ! One member representing military and veterans affairs; and SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended April 2, 2024 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading April 1, 2024 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Zenzinger and Kirkmeyer, Bridges, Buckner, Coleman, Cutter, Exum, Fenberg, Fields, Gardner, Hansen, Jaquez Lewis, Lundeen, Marchman, Michaelson Jenet, Pelton B., Pelton R., Priola, Rich, Simpson, Will HOUSE SPONSORSHIP McLachlan, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! One at-large member. The bill also directs the commission and history Colorado to hold any gifts, grants, or donations in the America 250 - Colorado 150 cash fund (cash fund). The bill modifies the cash fund so that all money in the cash fund may be used to support the following duties of the commission: ! Providing community grants to communities across the state to assist recipient communities with providing local opportunities related to commemoration of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States and the 150th anniversary of Colorado statehood; and ! Developing and promoting plans for statewide recognition of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States and the 150th anniversary of Colorado statehood between July 1, 2025, and December 31, 2026, including but not limited to: ! Historical activities; ! The creation and publication of historical documents; ! Cooperation with agencies responsible for the preservation or restoration of historic sites, buildings, art, and artifacts; ! Educational opportunities for Colorado youth to understand their historic roots in the United States and Colorado; ! The promotion of scholarship and research that illuminates the history of the American west and Colorado within the larger story of the United States; ! The arrangement of appropriate public ceremonies; and ! Commemorative events, supported by a comprehensive marketing and tourism campaign. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-80-215, amend2 (3)(a) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI) introductory portion, (3)(a)(VI)(F),3 (3)(a)(VI)(G), (3)(b), and (8); amend as added by House Bill 24-12094 (8.5)(a) and (8.5)(c); add (3)(a)(VI)(H), (3)(a)(VI)(I), (3)(a)(VI)(J),5 and (3)(a)(VI)(K); and add to (8.5) as added by House Bill 24-12096 (8.5)(f) as follows:7 170-2- 24-80-215. America 250 - Colorado 150 commission - creation1 - powers and duties - report - definitions - repeal. (3) Membership2 and appointments. (a) The commission consists of fifteen TWENTY3 voting members as follows:4 (VI) Ten FIFTEEN members appointed by the governor, as follows:5 (F) One member with experience in the study and documentation6 of the history of Asian American communities in Colorado; and7 (G) Four members determined by the governor, in the governor's8 discretion, to enhance and expand the expertise of the commission with9 regards to its duties as set forth in subsection (4) of this section. TWO10 MEMBERS WHO ARE COLORADO RESIDENTS REPRESENTING INDIGENOUS11 COMMUNITIES, AS DEFINED IN SECTION 24-33.5-2601 (2), AND WHO ARE12 MEMBERS OF A FEDERALLY RECOGNIZED TRIBE WITH HISTORIC TIES TO13 C OLORADO THAT IS NOT THE UTE MOUNTAIN UTE TRIBE OR THE14 S OUTHERN UTE INDIAN TRIBE;15 (H) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING MILITARY AND VETERANS16 AFFAIRS;17 (I) O NE MEMBER WHO IS AN EXPERT IN DISABILITY HISTORY OR IS 18 WORKING FOR A DISABILITY RIGHTS ORGANIZATION ;19 (J) ONE AT-LARGE MEMBER; AND20 (K) FOUR MEMBERS DETERMINED BY THE GOVERNOR , IN THE21 GOVERNOR'S DISCRETION, TO ENHANCE AND EXPAND THE EXPERTISE OF22 THE COMMISSION WITH REGARDS TO ITS DUTIES AS SET FORTH IN23 SUBSECTION (4) OF THIS SECTION.24 (b) The governor shall make appointments to the commission as25 set forth in subsections (3)(a)(VI)(A) to (3)(a)(VI)(F) of this section on26 or before September 1, 2022. The governor shall make appointments to27 170 -3- the commission as set forth in subsection (3)(a)(VI)(G) SUBSECTION1 (3)(a)(VI)(K) of this section on or before October 1, 2023. THE2 GOVERNOR SHALL MAKE APPOINTMENTS TO THE COMMISSION AS SET3 FORTH IN SUBSECTIONS (3)(a)(VI)(G) TO (3)(a)(VI)(J) OF THIS SECTION4 NOT LATER THAN THIRTY DAYS AFTER THE EFFECTIVE DATE OF SENATE5 B ILL 24-170, ENACTED IN 2024. In making appointments, the governor6 shall attempt to ensure that the members represent the geographic7 diversity of the state.8 (8) Gifts, grants, and donations. History Colorado and the9 commission may seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from10 private or public sources for the purposes of this section. H ISTORY11 C OLORADO AND THE COMMISSION SHALL TRANSMIT ALL MONEY RECEIVED12 THROUGH GIFTS, GRANTS, OR DONATIONS PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION 13 (8) TO THE STATE TREASURER, WHO SHALL CREDIT THE MONEY TO THE14 FUND.15 (8.5) Cash fund. (a) The America 250 - Colorado 150 cash fund16 is created in the state treasury. The fund consists of earned revenue from17 the sale of commemorative items sold in connection with the18 commission's marketing authority set forth in subsection (4)(a)(I)(G)19 SUBSECTION (4) of this section that is received and credited to the fund20 pursuant to this subsection (8.5); GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS21 RECEIVED BY THE COMMISSION OR HISTORY COLORADO PURSUANT TO22 SUBSECTION (8) OF THIS SECTION; and any other money that the general23 assembly may appropriate or transfer to the fund.24 (c) Money in the fund is continuously appropriated to the25 commission through history Colorado for the purpose PURPOSES of26 ACCOMPLISHING THE DUTIES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (4)(a)(I) OF THIS27 170 -4- SECTION AND providing community grants to communities across the state1 to assist recipient communities with providing local opportunities related2 to commemoration of the two hundred fiftieth anniversary of the founding3 of the United States and the one hundred fiftieth anniversary of Colorado4 statehood such as those set forth in subsection (4)(a)(II) of this section.5 Money in the fund may also be used by the commission for the purpose6 of administering, implementing, and effectuating the community grants.7 (f) O N JULY 1, 2024, THE STATE TREASURER SHALL TRANSFER TWO 8 HUNDRED FIFTY THOUSAND DOLLARS FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE9 FUND.10 SECTION 2. Safety clause. The general assembly finds,11 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate12 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety or for appropriations for13 the support and maintenance of the departments of the state and state14 institutions.15 170 -5-