Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 4, 2024
Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024