Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 19, 2024
Fiscal Note April 16, 2024
Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Bill April 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2024

Amended

Bill April 26, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024