LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB208
Action History
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2024 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB208
Action History
Senate
04/29/2024
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/26/2024
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/29/2024 - No Amendments
Senate
04/26/2024
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Senate
04/23/2024
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Senate
04/16/2024
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance