Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB223 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/23/2024

                    Page 1 
July 23, 2024  SB 24-223 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1150  
Sen. Fenberg; Gardner 
Rep. Synder 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 23, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: LICENSING FOR CLINICS THAT PROVIDE FERTILITY SERVICES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill makes changes to the licensing requirements for gamete agencies, gamete 
banks, and fertility clinics. The bill increases state expenditures and requires state 
transfers beginning in FY 2025-26.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-223 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-     $125,000     
 	Total Expenditures 	-     $125,000     
Transfers
1
 	General Fund 	-  ($125,000)  
 	Cash Funds 	- $125,000 
 	Net Transfer 	- 	$0 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	- $18,750 
1
 This transfer is made via an appropriation from the General Fund. 
   Page 2 
July 23, 2024  SB 24-223 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Gamete agencies, gamete banks, and fertility clinics are required to be licensed by the 
Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) beginning January 1, 2025. The bill 
extends the deadline to become licensed to July 1, 2025; extends the deadline for rulemaking by 
the department to January 1, 2025; requires licensees to submit documentation that shows 
compliance with licensing requirements initially and upon license renewal; and authorizes the 
CDPHE to perform on-site inspections or investigations of complaints of clinics located outside 
of Colorado, subject to available appropriations. Finally, the bill appropriates $125,000 annually 
from the General Fund to the Gamete Agency, Gamete Bank, or Fertility Clinic Fund beginning in 
FY 2025-26.  
Background 
Senate Bill 22-224 required gamete banks and fertility clinics to become licensed by the State 
Board of Health in the CDPHE. The bill appropriated funding from the General Fund to the 
CDPHE to implement the regulation in the first two years (FY 2022-23 and FY 2023-24), with 
costs in FY 2024-25 and beyond expected to be partially paid from the Gamete Agency, Gamete 
Bank, and Fertility Clinic Fund once fees for these facilities were established. The amount of 
annual fee revenue expected to be collected beginning in FY 2024-25 as a result of the 
January 1, 2025 licensing deadline was $22,500. 
State Revenue 
By moving the licensing deadline from January 1, 2025 to July 1, 2025, some state revenue from 
licensing fees on gamete banks and fertility clinics may be shifted from FY 2024-25 to 
FY 2025-26. The total revenue is not expected to change due to this bill. These fees are subject 
to TABOR. 
State Transfer 
Beginning in FY 2025-26, the bill transfers $125,000 annually from the General Fund to the 
Gamete Agency, Gamete Bank, or Fertility Clinic Fund. These annual transfers occur via 
appropriations to the fund from the General Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by $125,000 annually beginning in 
FY 2025-26, paid from the Gamete Agency, Gamete Bank, or Fertility Clinic Fund. Funding will be 
used to implement licensing for gamete banks and fertility clinics, including staff costs and costs 
for ensuring compliance, processing licenses, and providing technical assistance and education.  
   Page 3 
July 23, 2024  SB 24-223 
 
 
 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 22, 2024. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Public Health and Environment     Legislative Council Staff 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.