Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 23, 2024
Fiscal Note May 4, 2024
Fiscal Note April 26, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024
Bill May 7, 2024