Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB231 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/16/2024

                    Page 1 
July 16, 2024  SB 24-231 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-1176  
Sen. Rodriguez; Gardner 
Rep. Snyder; Frizell  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 16, 2024 
Signed into Law 
John Armstrong | 303-866-6289 
john.armstrong@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: ALCOHOL BEVERAGE LIQUOR ADV ISORY GROUP RECOMMENDATIONS 
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill makes several changes to liquor licensing and regulation. The bill increases 
state revenue and expenditures and has a minimal workload impact on local 
governments beginning in FY 2024-25.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $5,000 to the 
Department of Revenue. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 24-231 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 
 
-  	-  
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$5,000 	-  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts 
 
-  	-  
   Page 2 
July 16, 2024  SB 24-231 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill makes several changes to liquor enforcement and administration.  
Licensing changes. Under current law, one liquor license exists for lodging and entertainment 
facilities. The bill separates this license into two separate license types for each facility.  
The bill also creates two new license types: an alcohol beverage shipper license for shippers that 
sell wine for certain licensed wineries, and a catering license that allows caterers to be permitted 
to sell and serve alcohol on unlicensed premises at catered events. These new license types do 
not take effect until the Liquor Enforcement Division (LED) in the Department of Revenue (DOR) 
has sufficient legally available funding, no earlier than January 1, 2026.  
Under current law, a winery may have one manufacturing license for two noncontiguous 
locations provided they are within 10 miles of each other. The bill expands this ability for 
licensed premises to have two separate locations to include limited wineries, distilleries and 
breweries.  
Feasibility study. The bill requires the LED to undertake a feasibility study for adopting an 
online portal system which would allow liquor license applications and renewals to be 
completed online. The study must be completed by January 1, 2028, and report to the legislative 
finance committees by March 1, 2028.  
Local licensing authorities. The bill allows local liquor licensing authorities to delegate their 
licensing authority to the state when the location of the business is on state-owned property. 
The bill removes the requirement that a local liquor licensing authority hold a public hearing 
upon receipt of a license application.  
Tastings and classes. Under current law, tastings conducted by liquor licensees may not occur 
before 11 a.m. The bill changes the time to 10 a.m. Additionally, the bill allows off-premises 
retailers to conduct tastings, subject to certain requirements, and allows retail liquor stores to 
hold educational classes so long as they not charge a per-drink fee. These licensees must track 
participants to ensure they do not allow participants to attend another tasting event on the 
premises on the same day.  
Biennial licenses. Currently, liquor licenses are renewed annually. The bill allows biennial (every 
two year) renewal. Payments for biennial licenses are divided between two annual payments. 
The LED may require a business to obtain an annual license if certain rules are violated.  
Distillery sales rooms. The bill allows distillers that have a sales room to purchase and use 
common beverages to combine with their products to produce cocktails for consumption on or 
off the premises.  
Wholesalers. The bill allows wholesalers to obtain an importer’s license and to conduct trade 
show events to allow businesses to sample products.  
   Page 3 
July 16, 2024  SB 24-231 
 
 
Transfer of inventory and license. A liquor licensed retail store that is going out of business 
may sell its inventory to another licensee, provided both the buyer and the seller abide by 
certain requirements. The seller’s license may be transferred to the buyer if certain requirements 
are met. 
Sales from retail liquor stores to other license types. Under current law, certain license types 
may purchase up to $2,000 worth of product from a retail liquor store annually. The bill 
increases this limit to $7,000 annually and provides the ability for this limit to be adjusted for 
inflation. The LED must post this limit annually on their website.  
Christmas Day sales. The bill allows sale of alcoholic beverages on December 25.  
Prohibition on marijuana sales. The bill prohibits liquor licensees from selling marijuana 
products.  
Comparable Crime Analysis 
Legislative Council Staff is required to include certain information in the fiscal note for any bill 
that creates a new crime, changes the classification of an existing crime, or creates a new factual 
basis for an existing crime. The following section outlines crimes that are comparable to the 
offense in this bill and discusses assumptions on future rates of criminal convictions resulting 
from the bill. 
Prior conviction data and assumptions. This bill removes factual bases for various unlawful 
acts in the Colorado Liquor Code, which are class 2 misdemeanors. From FY 2020-21 to 
FY 2022-23, zero offenders have been sentenced and convicted for a liquor code-related 
offense; therefore, the fiscal note assumes that there will continue to be minimal or no 
additional criminal case filings or convictions for this offense under the bill. Because the bill is 
not expected to have a tangible impact on criminal justice-related revenue or expenditures at 
the state or local levels, these potential impacts are not discussed further in this fiscal note.  
State Revenue 
The bill allows licenses to convert from an annual license to a biennial license; however, the 
billing cycle for these biennial licenses is still annual and is not expected to have an impact on 
state revenue.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the DOR by $5,000 in FY 2024-25, paid from the LED 
Cash Fund. LED’s licensing software will require programming to split the current lodging and 
entertainment license into separate licenses. The bill also increases workload for DOR to conduct 
rulemaking and modify enforcement procedures and materials, although no change in 
appropriations is required for this workload 
   Page 4 
July 16, 2024  SB 24-231 
 
 
The new catering and winery shipping licenses will require additional criminal investigators and 
administration to process new applications and enforce regulations for these license holders; 
however, their implementation is contingent upon available funding. The fiscal note assumes 
that funding is not available and that these new license types will not be available to caterers 
and winery shippers until a funding source is identified. For informational purposes, the 
administrative cost associated with administering these two licenses is estimated at $526,646, 
which includes the cost of 4.2 FTE, contract enforcement operatives, and compliance investigator 
equipment and vehicle costs.  
Local Government  
Local liquor licensing authorities will have decreased workload due to the removal of the 
requirement to hold a public hearing whenever a new license application is received. However, 
complying with the bill’s other provisions may result in updating forms and procedures. The net 
impact of the bill is expected to be neutral for local governments.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 18
, 
2024, and takes effect on 
August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed, except that the sections of the 
bill create the new catering and winery shipping licenses take effect once the Department 
of Revenue has identified funding for that purpose.  
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a $5,000 appropriation to the Department of 
Revenue from the Liquor Enforcement Division and State Licensing Authority Cash Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Revenue 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit the General Assembly website.