Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 16, 2024
Fiscal Note May 7, 2024
Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Bill May 1, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill May 8, 2024