Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/08/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/04/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/24 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/14/24 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|