03/08/2024 | Governor Signed | |||
02/27/2024 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 02/22/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |