House | 03/05/2024 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/16/24 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |