Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1009 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2025
Fiscal Note January 23, 2025
Bill January 8, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2025
Bill February 6, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 24, 2025

Amended

Bill March 11, 2025
Bill March 10, 2025