Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 11, 2025
Bill January 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2025
Bill March 3, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2025

Amended

Bill April 4, 2025
Bill April 3, 2025