Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 19, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2025
Bill February 28, 2025

Amended

Bill April 14, 2025
Bill April 11, 2025