Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 3, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Amended

Bill May 2, 2025