LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB015
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB015
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2025 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB015
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
January 13, 2025
Bill
January 8, 2025
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 25, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 24, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 1, 2025
Compare
Amended
Bill
March 26, 2025
Compare
Bill
March 25, 2025
Compare