Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB035 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 22, 2025
Bill January 8, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2025
Bill February 24, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2025

Amended

Bill April 14, 2025
Bill April 11, 2025