Colorado 2025 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB086 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 30, 2025
Bill January 23, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2025
Bill February 25, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 8, 2025

Amended

Bill March 31, 2025
Bill March 27, 2025