04/13/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/03/2010 | File Number 7 | |||
03/03/2010 | House Calendar Number 22 | |||
03/03/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/05/2010 | Public Hearing 02/11 | |||
02/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |