04/13/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/31/2010 | File Number 224 | |||
03/31/2010 | House Calendar Number 138 | |||
03/31/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/16/2010 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |