04/20/2010 | File Number 602 | |||
04/20/2010 | House Calendar Number 368 | |||
04/20/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/05/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/05/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/23/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/22/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/18/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/05/2010 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |