|
05/27/2010
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-55
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
File Number 636
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 479
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 3855
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3486
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
File Number 135
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
House Calendar Number 89
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|