03/29/2010 | File Number 176 | |||
03/29/2010 | House Calendar Number 113 | |||
03/29/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/12/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/19/2010 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |