|
04/29/2010
|
File Number 672
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 505
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4465
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3545
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
File Number 141
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
House Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|