|
06/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Public Act 10-87
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
File Number 642
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 482
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3884
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
File Number 312
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
House Calendar Number 167
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|