|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Public Act 10-164
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
File Number 667
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 509
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4313
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
File Number 589
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
File Number 213
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
House Calendar Number 127
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|