05/05/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/30/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
04/29/2010 | Public Act 10-9 | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/08/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 296 | |||
04/08/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/07/2010 | House Passed | |||
03/18/2010 | File Number 65 | |||
03/18/2010 | House Calendar Number 55 | |||
03/18/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/18/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/02/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/11/2010 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |