04/22/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/22/2010 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/22/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/22/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/15/2010 | File Number 555 | |||
04/15/2010 | House Calendar Number 344 | |||
04/15/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/05/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/03/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/22/2010 | Public Hearing 02/26 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |