|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 575
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5712
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
File Number 178
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
House Calendar Number 115
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
|
|
|