|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Public Act 10-169
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
File Number 623
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 445
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3447
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
File Number 357
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
House Calendar Number 190
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|