04/28/2010 | File Number 662 | |||
04/28/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 495 | |||
04/28/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/27/2010 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4346 | |||
04/12/2010 | File Number 446 | |||
04/12/2010 | House Calendar Number 251 | |||
04/12/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/24/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |