|
06/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Public Act 10-80
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 374
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
File Number 179
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
House Calendar Number 116
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|