03/31/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/31/2010 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/31/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/16/2010 | File Number 58 | |||
03/16/2010 | House Calendar Number 46 | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/02/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/19/2010 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |