05/10/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/05/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/04/2010 | Public Act 10-28 | |||
04/28/2010 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
04/28/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/22/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 456 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2010 | House Passed | |||
03/16/2010 | File Number 60 | |||
03/16/2010 | House Calendar Number 48 | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/16/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/22/2010 | Public Hearing 02/26 | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |