|
05/10/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Public Act 10-30
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
File Number 544
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 372
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3317
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
File Number 69
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
House Calendar Number 59
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|