|
05/04/2010
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4066
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 376
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
File Number 315
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
House Calendar Number 170
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|