|
05/05/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Public Act 10-17
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 379
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
File Number 362
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
House Calendar Number 195
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|