LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05279
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05279
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2010 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05279
Action History
03/22/2010
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/19/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
03/18/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
03/17/2010
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/16/2010
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
03/03/2010
Public Hearing 03/11
02/22/2010
Referred to Joint Committee on Banks