06/07/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/26/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/20/2010 | Public Act 10-131 | |||
05/05/2010 | In Concurrence | |||
05/05/2010 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/05/2010 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/22/2010 | File Number 624 | |||
04/22/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 443 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2010 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/20/2010 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3682 | |||
03/23/2010 | File Number 106 | |||
03/23/2010 | House Calendar Number 77 | |||
03/23/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |