04/13/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 275 | |||
04/01/2010 | House Calendar Number 150 | |||
04/01/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |