LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05310
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05310
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2010 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05310
Action History
03/15/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
03/12/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
03/11/2010
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/10/2010
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/09/2010
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
02/25/2010
Public Hearing 03/02
02/24/2010
Referred to Joint Committee on Children