04/13/2010 | File Number 485 | |||
04/13/2010 | House Calendar Number 291 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |