|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Public Act 10-167
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
File Number 680
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 520
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4350
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
File Number 423
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
House Calendar Number 222
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|